KY SB10 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - recommitted to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 156.029 to require appointments to the Kentucky Board of Education to reflect equal gender representation and proportionally reflect the Commonwealth's political affiliation and minority racial composition; prohibit the Governor from reorganizing the board; amend KRS 156.040 to conform; decline confirmation of Executive Order 2019-002 and Kentucky Board of Education appointments contained therein; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the Kentucky Board of Education and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-26Senaterecommitted to Education (S)
2020-03-19Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2020-03-18Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2020-03-17Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2020-03-17Senatefloor amendment (1) filed
2020-03-12Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2020-03-10Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 12, 2020
2020-03-06Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-05Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-02-27Senateto Education (S)
2020-02-25Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback