KY HR91 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - recommitted to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
Pending: House Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - recommitted to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
Pending: House Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Support the United Nations Convention on the Elimination of All Forms of Discrimination Against Women.
Title
Support the United Nations Convention on the Elimination of All Forms of Discrimination Against Women.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | recommitted to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2015-03-23 | House | taken from Rules |
2015-03-04 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed |
2015-03-04 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2015-02-27 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-05 | House | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2015-02-04 | House | introduced in House |