KY HR85 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognize March 4, 2022, as PFAS Chemical Awareness Day in Kentucky.
Title
A RESOLUTION recognizing March 4, 2022, as PFAS Chemical Awareness Day in Kentucky.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | House | adopted by voice vote |
2022-03-03 | House | to House Floor |
2022-03-03 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-02-22 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-02-22 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Commendations and Recognitions
Environment and Conservation
Pollution
Public Health
Reproductive Issues
Water Supply
Environment and Conservation
Pollution
Public Health
Reproductive Issues
Water Supply
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/22RS/hr85.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/22RS/hr85/orig_bill.pdf |