KY HR80 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Honor the seven men killed on January 20, 1982, in a coal mine blast at Mink Branch in Craynor, Kentucky.
Title
A RESOLUTION honoring the seven men killed on January 20, 1982, in a coal mine blast at Mink Branch in Craynor, Kentucky.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | adopted by voice vote |
2019-02-11 | House | to House Floor |
2019-02-08 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/hr80.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/hr80/orig_bill.pdf |