KY HR78 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Request the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to establish policies and reports related to children in out-of-home care during the COVID-19 pandemic.
Title
A RESOLUTION urging the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to establish policies and reports related to children in out-of-home care during the COVID-19 pandemic.
Sponsors
Rep. Billy Wesley [R] | Rep. John Blanton [R] | Rep. Joshua Branscum [R] | Rep. Ryan Dotson [R] |
Rep. Deanna Frazier Gordon [R] | Rep. David Hale [R] | Rep. Kim King [R] | Rep. Jerry Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | adopted by voice vote |
2021-03-15 | House | to House Floor |
2021-03-15 | House | taken from Rules |
2021-03-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-03-11 | House | posted in committee |
2021-03-04 | House | to Health & Family Services (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/21RS/hr78.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/21RS/hr78/orig_bill.pdf |