KY HR46 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognize November as Epilepsy Awareness Month.
Title
A RESOLUTION recognizing November as Epilepsy Awareness Month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | adopted by voice vote |
2020-02-18 | House | to House Floor |
2020-02-18 | House | taken from Rules (H) |
2020-02-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-11 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-17 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2020-01-15 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/hr46.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/hr46/orig_bill.pdf |