KY HR37 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - to House Floor
Pending: House Floor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - to House Floor
Pending: House Floor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urge the United States Congress to amend Title II of the Social Security Act to repeal the government pension offset and the windfall elimination provision.
Title
A RESOLUTION urging the United States Congress to amend Title II of the Social Security Act to repeal the government pension offset and the windfall elimination provision.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | House | to House Floor |
2024-02-15 | House | taken from Rules |
2024-02-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-02-01 | House | to Education (H) |
2024-01-09 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-09 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/24RS/hr37.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/24RS/hr37/orig_bill.pdf |