KY HR32 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Honor Kentucky farmers and recognize February 7 to 13, 2021, as Food Check-Out Week.
Title
A RESOLUTION honoring Kentucky's farmers for helping provide citizens with the most nutritious and affordable food in the world, and recognizing February 7 to 13, 2021, as Food Check-Out Week in Kentucky.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Heath [R] | Rep. Kim King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | adopted by voice vote |
2021-02-09 | House | to House Floor |
2021-02-09 | House | taken from Agriculture (H) |
2021-02-02 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-02 | House | to Agriculture (H) |
2021-01-13 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-13 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/21RS/hr32.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/21RS/hr32/orig_bill.pdf |