KY HR31 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-12 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-12 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Celebrate the 211th birthday of Abraham Lincoln.
Title
A RESOLUTION celebrating the 211th birthday of Abraham Lincoln.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | House | adopted by voice vote |
2020-01-27 | House | to House Floor |
2020-01-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-01-21 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-13 | House | to State Government (H) |
2020-01-09 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/hr31.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/hr31/orig_bill.pdf |