KY HR26 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognize February 22 to 29, 2020, as FFA Week in Kentucky.
Title
A RESOLUTION recognizing February 22 to 29, 2020, as FFA Week in Kentucky.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandon Reed [R] | Rep. Kim King [R] | Rep. James Tipton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | House | adopted by voice vote |
2020-02-27 | House | to House Floor |
2020-02-27 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-26 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-01-15 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-13 | House | to Agriculture (H) |
2020-01-09 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/hr26.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/hr26/orig_bill.pdf |