KY HR20 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - 3rd reading, adopted 93-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - 3rd reading, adopted 93-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognize the second Monday of October of each year as Indigenous Peoples' Day in Kentucky.
Title
A RESOLUTION relating to indigenous peoples.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - House - House: Adopt RCS# 43 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | House | 3rd reading, adopted 93-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-27 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, January 28, 2020 |
2020-01-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-21 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-10 | House | to State Government (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | introduced in House |