KY HR17 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-15 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-15 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Declare January 15, 2020, to be Hunger Free Kentucky Day.
Title
A RESOLUTION declaring January 15, 2020, to be Hunger Free Kentucky Day.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Heath [R] | Rep. Chris Freeland [R] | Rep. Mark Hart [R] | Rep. Kim King [R] |
Rep. Brandon Reed [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | House | adopted by voice vote |
2020-01-15 | House | to House Floor |
2020-01-15 | House | reported favorably |
2020-01-13 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-09 | House | to Agriculture (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/hr17.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/hr17/orig_bill.pdf |