KY HR15 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-26 - adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-26 - adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognize February 20 to 27, 2021, as FFA Week in Kentucky.
Title
A RESOLUTION recognizing February 20 to 27, 2021, as FFA Week in Kentucky.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandon Reed [R] | Rep. Kim King [R] | Rep. Felicia Rabourn [R] | Rep. Steven Rudy [R] |
Rep. James Tipton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-26 | House | adopted |
2021-02-25 | House | to House Floor |
2021-02-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-02 | House | to Agriculture (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/21RS/hr15.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/21RS/hr15/orig_bill.pdf |