KY HR142 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-02 - 3rd reading, adopted 90-0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-02 - 3rd reading, adopted 90-0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Demand the United States government to aggressively pursue the release of Pastor Saeed Abedini from captivity in Iran.
Title
Demand the United States government to aggressively pursue the release of Pastor Saeed Abedini from captivity in Iran.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | House | 3rd reading, adopted 90-0 |
2015-02-27 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2015-02-27 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 2, 2015 |
2015-02-27 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-26 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-02-24 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-12 | House | to State Government (H) |
2015-02-11 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HR142.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HR142/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HR142/vote_history.pdf |