KY HR14 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-05 - to House Floor
Pending: House Floor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Proclaim April 26, 2021, to be Diabetic Ketoacidosis Awareness Day in Kentucky.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION proclaiming April 26, 2021, to be Diabetic Ketoacidosis Awareness Day in Kentucky.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05Houseto House Floor
2021-03-05House2nd reading, to Rules
2021-03-04Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2021-03-01Houseposted in committee
2021-02-02Houseto Health & Family Services (H)
2021-01-05Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2021-01-05Houseintroduced in House
2020-09-16HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback