KY HR12 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Declare May 2020 to be Ehlers-Danlos Syndrome Awareness Month.
Title
A RESOLUTION declaring May 2020 to be Ehlers-Danlos Syndrome Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Rep. Regina Huff [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | adopted by voice vote |
2020-01-27 | House | to House Floor |
2020-01-27 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2020-01-21 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 22, 2020 |
2020-01-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-01-13 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-07 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2019-10-04 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/hr12.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/hr12/orig_bill.pdf |