KY HR11 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urge Congress to require car manufacturers to install safety features to help prevent children from being left in hot cars.
Title
A RESOLUTION urging Congress to require car manufacturers to improve safety devices on automobiles for the protection of children left in cars.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | adopted by voice vote |
2020-01-21 | House | to House Floor |
2020-01-21 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2020-01-16 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 17, 2020 |
2020-01-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-01-10 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-07 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2019-09-06 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/hr11.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/hr11/orig_bill.pdf |