KY HR106 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution encouraging local boards of education to solicit private support to provide bleeding control kits and training.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION encouraging local boards of education to solicit private support to provide for bleeding control kits and training.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17Houserecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2020-03-17House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-12Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-03-09Houseposted in committee
2020-02-28Housefloor amendment (2) filed
2020-02-27Housefloor amendment (1) filed
2020-02-27Houseto Education (H)
2020-02-25Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback