KY HJR74 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 161)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 161)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Provide that the General Assembly shall adopt the last four years of the six year road plan as a joint resolution.
Title
Provide that the General Assembly shall adopt the last four years of the six year road plan as a joint resolution.
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Rudy [R] | Rep. Sal Santoro [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-13 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 161) |
2018-04-02 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-04-02 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-04-02 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-04-02 | House | Bill passed 75-15 |
2018-04-02 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute |
2018-04-02 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute |
2018-04-02 | House | taken from Rules |
2018-03-22 | House | to Rules (H) |
2018-03-22 | House | received in House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 22, 2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2018-03-16 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | 1st reading |
2018-03-15 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-07 | House | 3rd reading, passed 71-21 with Committee Substitute |
2018-03-06 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 7, 2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute |
2018-03-01 | House | posted in committee |
2018-03-01 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-03-01 | House | 1st reading |
2018-03-01 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-01-18 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-01-16 | House | introduced in House |