KY HJR42 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Grant the family of the last remaining World War II veteran in Kentucky, upon his or her passing, the option of the veteran to lie in state in the Capitol Rotunda and receive a funeral with full military honors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A JOINT RESOLUTION granting the family of the last remaining World War II veteran in Kentucky, upon his or her passing, the option of the veteran to lie in state in the Capitol Rotunda and receive a funeral with full military honors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 164 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-03Senateto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2022-02-24Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2022-02-24Senatereceived in Senate
2022-02-23House3rd reading, adopted 97-0
2022-02-02Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 03, 2022
2022-02-02House2nd reading, to Rules
2022-02-01Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2022-01-28Houseto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H)
2022-01-19Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2022-01-19Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback