KY HJR39 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Direct the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to study all public assistance program flexibilities permitted under federal law which may afford the Commonwealth the opportunity to address the benefits cliff; require the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to study the cost of maintaining certain changes made to the Child Care Assistance Program; require the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to implement a user-friendly benefits cliff calculator tool; and require the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to develop and implement a federal Earned Income Tax Credit outreach and education program; require these agencies to submit reports to the Interim Joint Committees on Health, Welfare, and Family Services and Appropriations and Revenue by November 1, 2023.
Title
A JOINT RESOLUTION directing executive branch agencies to undertake efforts to address the benefits cliff in Kentucky.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Adopt FINAL RSN# 2589 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: Adopt RCS# 58 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: Adopt RCS# 58 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 9) |
2023-03-13 | House | delivered to Governor |
2023-03-13 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2023-03-13 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2023-03-13 | House | received in House |
2023-03-10 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 10, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2023-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2023-03-02 | Senate | to Families & Children (S) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2023-02-21 | House | 3rd reading, adopted 100-0 |
2023-02-17 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 21, 2023 |
2023-02-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-02-16 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2023-02-14 | House | to Families & Children (H) |
2023-02-10 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-02-10 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Legislative Research Commission
Public Assistance
Reports Mandated
State Agencies
Taxation, Income--Individual
Public Assistance
Reports Mandated
State Agencies
Taxation, Income--Individual