KY HJR16 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Designate and declare the Mallard as the State Game Waterfowl of Kentucky.
Title
Designate and declare the Mallard as the State Game Waterfowl of Kentucky.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-01-29 | House | 3rd reading, passed 89-0 |
2018-01-26 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, January 29, 2018 |
2018-01-26 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-01-25 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-01-19 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-04 | House | to Tourism & Outdoor Recreation (H) |
2018-01-02 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HJR16.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HJ16/bill.pdf |