KY HJR116 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Declare that the power to determine the sufficiency of ballot language for amendment to the Constitution of Kentucky rests with the General Assembly; declare the role of the Kentucky Supreme Court is to review the ballot language to determine whether it accurately and fairly informs the voter of the substance of the amendment; declare that the Supreme Court's opinion in Westerfield v. Ward is limited to that particular case and shall not be followed by the executive or legislative branches of the government of Kentucky.
Title
A JOINT RESOLUTION declaring that the General Assembly has the sole authority under Section 256 of the Constitution of Kentucky to determine the sufficiency of ballot language for amendments to the Constitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 268 (Y: 57 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-19 | House | 3rd reading, passed 57-26 |
2020-03-18 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-03-03 | House | posted in committee |
2020-03-02 | House | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2020-02-27 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Constitution, Ky.
Court, Supreme
Courts
General Assembly
Governor
Legislative Research Commission
State Agencies
Court, Supreme
Courts
General Assembly
Governor
Legislative Research Commission
State Agencies