KY HCR88 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reestablish the Public Water and Wastewater System Infrastructure Task Force; direct the task force to continue to evaluate policy options on how to address Kentucky's troubled public water and wastewater systems; name the membership of the task force; require the task force to meet at least three times during the 2020 Interim and to submit its findings, legislative recommendations, or a memorandum to the Legislative Research Commission by November 30, 2020; provide that the Legislative Research Commission is authorized to alternatively assign the issues to be addressed by the task force to an interim joint committee or subcommittee thereof and to assign an alternative study completion date.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION reestablishing the Public Water and Wastewater System Infrastructure Task Force.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Gooch [R] | Rep. James Tipton [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 185 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2020-03-02 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 3, 2020 |
2020-02-28 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-27 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-21 | House | to Natural Resources & Energy (H) |
2020-02-19 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Environment and Conservation
General Assembly
Legislative Research Commission
Pollution
Public Utilities
Public Works
Sewer Systems
Task Forces, Legislative Branch
Water Supply
Waterways and Dams
General Assembly
Legislative Research Commission
Pollution
Public Utilities
Public Works
Sewer Systems
Task Forces, Legislative Branch
Water Supply
Waterways and Dams