KY HCR81 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 181)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Encourage full support of the Future Vertical Lift, a vital Department of Defense and U. S. Army modernization initiative.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION to fully support Future Vertical Lift, a vital modernization initiative of the Department of Defense and the United States Army.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1824 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 224 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-05Housesigned by Governor (Acts Ch. 181)
2021-03-30Housedelivered to Governor
2021-03-30Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2021-03-30Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2021-03-29Housereceived in House
2021-03-29Senate3rd reading, passed 38-0
2021-03-29Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 29, 2021
2021-03-16Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2021-03-15Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2021-03-11Senateto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2021-03-05Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2021-03-05Senatereceived in Senate
2021-03-05House3rd reading, adopted 91-0
2021-03-04Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 5, 2021
2021-03-04House2nd reading, to Rules
2021-03-03Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2021-03-02Houseposted in committee
2021-03-02Houseto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H)
2021-03-01Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback