KY HCR6 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-16 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Urge the United States Congress to amend Title II of the Social Security Act to repeal the Government Pension Offset provision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urge the United States Congress to amend Title II of the Social Security Act to repeal the Government Pension Offset provision.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-16Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2018-02-15Senatereceived in Senate
2018-02-14House3rd reading, passed 95-0
2018-02-13Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 14, 2018
2018-02-13House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-12Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2018-02-08Houseposted in committee
2018-01-02Houseto Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
2018-01-02Houseintroduced in House
2017-09-18HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback