KY HCR57 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - to Agriculture (S)
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - to Agriculture (S)
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Urge Congress to reassess the federal definition of hemp, allowing the product to contain up to one percent (1%) delta-9 tetrahydrocannabinol (THC).
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging Congress to reassess the federal definition of hemp, allowing the product to contain up to one percent (1%) delta-9 tetrahydrocannabinol (THC).
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Heath [R] | Rep. Mark Hart [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 94 (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Senate | to Agriculture (S) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-02-11 | House | 3rd reading, passed 90-1 |
2020-02-10 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 11, 2020 |
2020-02-06 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-05 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-01-31 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-28 | House | to Agriculture (H) |
2020-01-24 | House | introduced in House |