KY HCR52 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - posted in committee
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - posted in committee
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Direct the Legislative Research Commission to establish the Kentucky Preschool Program Task Force to study preschool programs; require findings and recommendations to be reported by November 30, 2020.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION directing the Legislative Research Commission to establish the Kentucky Preschool Program Task Force.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-24 | House | to Education (H) |
2020-01-22 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Education, Elementary and Secondary
General Assembly
Legislative Research Commission
Task Forces, Legislative Branch
General Assembly
Legislative Research Commission
Task Forces, Legislative Branch
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/hcr52.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/hcr52/orig_bill.pdf |