KY HCR5 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Urge federal policymakers to incorporate standards for safety and efficacy in the use of medical marijuana.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION calling for the expediting of research regarding the safety and efficacy of the use of marijuana for medical purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12Houserecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-02-12Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 13, 2019
2019-02-08House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-07Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-02-05Houseposted in committee
2019-01-10Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2019-01-08Houseintroduced in House
2018-09-20HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback