KY HCR47 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - to Committee on Committees (S)
Pending: Senate Committee on Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establish the Election Integrity and Security Task Force to study current elections processes in Kentucky.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION establishing the Election Integrity and Security Task Force.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 107 (Y: 79 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2021-02-25Senatereceived in Senate
2021-02-24House3rd reading, adopted 79-17
2021-02-22Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 23, 2021
2021-02-22House2nd reading, to Rules
2021-02-11Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2021-02-09Houseposted in committee
2021-02-04Houseto Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
2021-02-02Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2021-02-02Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback