KY HCR43 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Urge Facebook, YouTube, eBay, and Amazon to re-examine their policies relating to the marketing efforts of industrial hemp businesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging Facebook, YouTube, eBay, and Amazon to re-examine their policies relating to the marketing efforts of industrial hemp businesses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 64 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-03-05Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-02-19Senateto Agriculture (S)
2019-02-15Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-15House3rd reading, passed 96-0
2019-02-14Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2019
2019-02-14House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-13Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-02-07Houseposted in committee
2019-02-06Houseto Agriculture (H)
2019-02-05Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback