KY HCR35 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Urge local governments in Kentucky to partner and establish the support of school-based outreach programs and nonprofit community-based organizations in order to localize census efforts.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging local governments in Kentucky to partner and establish the support of school-based outreach programs and nonprofit community-based organizations in order to localize census efforts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 38 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-01-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-23 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 24, 2020 |
2020-01-23 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-22 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-15 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-14 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2020-01-10 | House | introduced in House |