KY HCR250 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Direct the Legislative Research Commission to create a Task Force on Notary Public Reform to study legislative action and proposals from around the United States on changes to notary laws; report the findings to the Legislative Research Commission by December 1, 2018.
Title
Direct the Legislative Research Commission to create a Task Force on Notary Public Reform to study legislative action and proposals from around the United States on changes to notary laws; report the findings to the Legislative Research Commission by December 1, 2018.
Sponsors
Rep. DJ Johnson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-22 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-03-21 | House | posting waived |
2018-03-21 | House | to State Government (H) |
2018-03-19 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HCR250.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HC250/bill.pdf |