KY HCR13 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-15 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-15 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Direct the Legislative Research Commission to establish the Legislative Task Force on Childhood Obesity to meet at least monthly during the 2011 Interim of the General Assembly; require the task force to report any recommendations and findings by November 30, 2011, to the Legislative Research Commission and the Interim Joint Committee on Health and Welfare.
Title
Direct the Legislative Research Commission to establish the Legislative Task Force on Childhood Obesity to meet at least monthly during the 2011 Interim of the General Assembly; require the task force to report any recommendations and findings by November 30, 2011, to the Legislative Research Commission and the Interim Joint Committee on Health and Welfare.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob DeWeese [R] | Rep. Tom Riner [D] | Rep. Addia Wuchner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | signed by Governor | |
2011-03-03 | delivered to Governor | |
2011-03-03 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2011-03-03 | received in House | |
2011-03-03 | 3rd reading, adopted 36-1 | |
2011-03-03 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 3, 2011 | |
2011-03-02 | reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill | |
2011-02-28 | returned to State & Local Government (S) | |
2011-02-28 | 2nd reading | |
2011-02-28 | taken from State & Local Government (S) | |
2011-02-25 | returned to State & Local Government (S) | |
2011-02-25 | 1st reading | |
2011-02-25 | taken from State & Local Government (S) | |
2011-02-18 | to State & Local Government (S) | |
2011-02-16 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-15 | 3rd reading, adopted 100-0 | |
2011-02-11 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 15, 2011 | |
2011-02-11 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-10 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-08 | posted in committee | |
2011-01-04 | to Health & Welfare (H) | |
2011-01-04 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HC13.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HC13/bill.doc |