KY HCR124 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create the Property Valuation Administrator's Office Task Force to study the operations and funding of the property valuation administrators' offices and the property valuation administrators' job requirements, property valuation methods, and timeframe in relation to the ad valorem taxation process; outline task force membership; require the task force to meet at least monthly during the 2020 Interim and to submit any proposed findings or recommendations to the Legislative Research Commission by December 1, 2020.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION establishing the Property Valuation Administrator's Office Task Force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 245 (Y: 79 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-17 | House | 3rd reading, passed 79-2 with floor amendment (1) |
2020-03-12 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2020-03-12 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-03-05 | House | posted in committee |
2020-03-04 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2020-03-02 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Legislative Research Commission
Property Valuation Administrators
Task Forces, Legislative Branch
Taxation
Taxation, Property
Property Valuation Administrators
Task Forces, Legislative Branch
Taxation
Taxation, Property