KY HCR121 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create the Medicinal Marijuana Task Force to study and make recommendations related to the medicinal use of marijuana in the Commonwealth; outline task force membership; require the task force to meet at least bimonthly during the 2019 Interim and to submit findings and recommendations to the Legislative Research Commission by December 1, 2019.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION establishing the Medicinal Marijuana Task Force.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-03-01 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-03-01 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 4, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-28 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-26 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-20 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2019-02-19 | House | introduced in House |