KY HCR117 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 22, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 22, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establish the Kentucky Kinship Task Force to study, review, and make recommendations regarding the current and future policy needs of the state to address access and availability of kinship care to the citizens of the Kentucky; outline task force membership; require the task force to meet monthly during the 2024 Interim; require the task force to submit findings and recommendations to the Legislative Research Commission by December 1, 2024.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION establishing the Kentucky Kinship Task Force.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-08 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-07 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-03-01 | House | to Families & Children (H) |
2024-02-26 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-26 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/24RS/hcr117.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/24RS/hcr117/orig_bill.pdf |