KY HCR115 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Urge Congress to establish a moratorium on closing coal-fired electric plants and to eliminate subsidies for renewable energy sources.
Title
Urge Congress to establish a moratorium on closing coal-fired electric plants and to eliminate subsidies for renewable energy sources.
Sponsors
Rep. John Blanton [R] | Sen. Matt Castlen [R] | Rep. Danny Bentley [R] | Rep. Tim Couch [R] |
Rep. Chris Fugate [R] | Rep. Melinda Prunty [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2018-03-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | passed 69-16 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2018-03-13 | House | floor amendment (1) defeated |
2018-03-13 | House | 3rd reading |
2018-03-06 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2-title) filed to Bill |
2018-03-06 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 7, 2018 |
2018-03-02 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-01 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2018-02-05 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-01 | House | to Natural Resources & Energy (H) |
2018-01-30 | House | introduced in House |