KY HCR113 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognize current success of the Ticket to Work program operated by the Social Security Administration; encourage the administration to better educate the public about the program; urge Congress to modify the current disability insurance program to encourage transition to work.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the United States Congress to modify permanent and partial disability benefits to encourage reentry into the workforce.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-19 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-03-02 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-28 | House | to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2020-02-26 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/hcr113.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/hcr113/orig_bill.pdf |