KY HB99 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 33)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 33)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate to the Cabinet for Economic Development General Fund moneys in the amount of $50,000,000 in fiscal year 2019-2020 for the establishment and implementation of the Direct Health Care Services and Research Facilities Operations Loan; set out parameters for the Direct Health Care Services and Research Facilities Operations Loan; direct the University of Louisville to provide an annual report detailing the status of any loan agreement granted under the Direct Health Care Services and Research Facilities Operations Loan for as long as the loan is in effect; stipulate that authorized appropriations shall be paid from the General Fund Surplus Account or the Budget Reserve Trust Fund Account; APPROPRIATION; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT creating and funding a Kentucky Economic Development Finance Authority loan for a qualifying public medical center located in a city of the first class, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. David Osborne [R] | Rep. Joni Jenkins [D] | Rep. Tina Bojanowski [D] | Rep. Alan Gentry [D] |
Rep. Nima Kulkarni [D] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] | Rep. Rob Rothenburger [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1328 (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 102 (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 102 (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | House | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 33) |
2020-03-18 | House | delivered to Governor |
2020-03-18 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-03-18 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-03-18 | House | received in House |
2020-03-17 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 23-10 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-05 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-20 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-02-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 86-7 with Committee Substitute (2) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-02-11 | House | floor amendments (5) and (6) filed to Committee Substitute (2) |
2020-02-11 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 12, 2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (2) |
2020-02-03 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-01-23 | House | floor amendments (2) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute , floor amendment (4-title) filed to bill |
2020-01-23 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 24, 2020 |
2020-01-23 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-22 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-01-22 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-01-14 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-07 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2019-11-15 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget and Financial Administration
Economic Development
Education, Finance
Education, Higher
Effective Dates, Emergency
Fiscal Note
Loans and Credit
State Agencies
Universities and Colleges
Budget and Financial Administration
Economic Development
Education, Finance
Education, Higher
Effective Dates, Emergency
Fiscal Note
Loans and Credit
State Agencies
Universities and Colleges