KY HB96 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-07 - posted in committee
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]

Summary

Amend KRS 189.030 to require the illumination of headlights on motor vehicles with a model year of 2000 or newer during any period of precipitation that necessitates the use of windshield wipers by motorists; specify that there will be a courtesy warning period until July 1, 2014; establish fine range of $20 to $100; specify that no court costs or points will be imposed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to transportation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-07Houseposted in committee
2013-01-09Houseto Transportation (H)
2013-01-08Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback