KY HB96 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 14)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]

Summary

Amend KRS 186.041 to permit the surviving spouse of a Purple Heart recipient to keep special license plate assigned to that recipient.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to special license plates.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-17 signed by Governor (Acts ch. 14)
2010-03-10 delivered to Governor
2010-03-10 enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
2010-03-10 received in House
2010-03-09 3rd reading, passed 37-0
2010-03-08 posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 9, 2010
2010-03-04 2nd reading, to Rules
2010-03-03 reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2010-01-25 to Transportation (S)
2010-01-22 received in Senate
2010-01-21 3rd reading, passed 99-0
2010-01-15 posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 21, 2010
2010-01-14 2nd reading, to Rules
2010-01-13 reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2010-01-11 posted in committee
2010-01-11 posting waived
2010-01-05 to Military Affairs & Public Safety (H)
2010-01-05 introduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback