KY HB95 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 44-25)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 75)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 304-17A.148 to cap the cost-sharing requirements for prescription insulin at $30 per 30 day supply; amend KRS 18A.225 to require the Kentucky Employee Health Plan to comply; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to prescription insulin.

Sponsors

Rep. Danny Bentley [R]Rep. Patti Minter [D]Rep. Kimberly Banta [R]Rep. John Blanton [R]
Rep. Tina Bojanowski [D]Rep. Joshua Branscum [R]Rep. Josh Bray [R]Rep. Randy Bridges [R]
Rep. George Brown [D]Rep. Thomas Burch [D]Rep. Josh Calloway [R]Rep. McKenzie Cantrell [D]
Rep. Jennifer Henson Decker [R]Rep. Jeffery Donohue [D]Rep. Myron Dossett [R]Rep. Ryan Dotson [R]
Rep. Jim Duplessis [R]Rep. Daniel Elliott [R]Rep. Joseph Fischer [R]Rep. Daniel Fister [R]
Rep. Patrick Flannery [R]Rep. Kelly Flood [D]Rep. Deanna Frazier [R]Rep. Chris Fugate [R]
Rep. Alan Gentry [D]Rep. Jim Gooch [R]Rep. Derrick Graham [D]Rep. David Hale [R]
Rep. Mark Hart [R]Rep. Angie Hatton [D]Rep. Samara Heavrin [R]Rep. Thomas Huff [R]
Rep. Joni Jenkins [D]Rep. DJ Johnson [R]Rep. Kim King [R]Rep. Norma Kirk-McCormick [R]
Rep. Nima Kulkarni [D]Rep. William Lawrence [R]Rep. Scott Lewis [R]Rep. Mary Marzian [D]
Rep. Ed Massey [R]Rep. Bobby McCool [R]Rep. Reginald Meeks [D]Rep. Michael Meredith [R]
Rep. Charles Miller [D]Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D]Rep. Phillip Pratt [R]Rep. Melinda Prunty [R]
Rep. Josie Raymond [D]Rep. William Reed [R]Rep. Steve Riley [R]Rep. Rachel Roberts [D]
Rep. Steven Rudy [R]Rep. Sal Santoro [R]Rep. Attica Scott [D]Rep. Scott Sharp [R]
Rep. Steve Sheldon [R]Rep. Cherlynn Stevenson [D]Rep. Pamela Stevenson [D]Rep. Ashley Tackett Laferty [D]
Rep. Nancy Tate [R]Rep. Walker Thomas [R]Rep. James Tipton [R]Rep. Ken Upchurch [R]
Rep. Russell Webber [R]Rep. Billy Wesley [R]Rep. Susan Westrom [D]Rep. Buddy Wheatley [D]
Rep. Lisa Willner [D]

Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1766 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1657 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 95 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-22Housesigned by Governor (Acts Ch. 75)
2021-03-16Housedelivered to Governor
2021-03-16Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2021-03-16Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2021-03-16Housereceived in House
2021-03-16SenateBill passed 36-0
2021-03-16SenateSenate receded from Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendments (2-title) and (3)
2021-03-15Senateposted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute, and floor amendments (3) and (2-title) for Tuesday, March 16, 2021
2021-03-15Senateto Rules (S)
2021-03-15Senatereceived in Senate
2021-03-12HouseHouse refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute, floor amendments (3) and (2-title)
2021-03-12Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute and floor amendments (3) and (2-title)
2021-03-12Housetaken from Rules
2021-03-11Houseto Rules (H)
2021-03-11Housereceived in House
2021-03-05Senatepassed 35-0 with Committee Substitute and floor amendments (3) and (2-title)
2021-03-05Senatefloor amendment (1) withdrawn
2021-03-05Senate3rd reading
2021-03-04Senatefloor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute
2021-03-03Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 5, 2021
2021-03-03Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2021-03-02Senatefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2) filed to bill
2021-03-02Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2021-02-26Senateto Banking & Insurance (S)
2021-02-24Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2021-02-24Senatereceived in Senate
2021-02-23House3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute
2021-02-22Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 23, 2021
2021-02-22House2nd reading, to Rules
2021-02-11Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
2021-02-10Houseposted in committee
2021-02-02Houseto Health & Family Services (H)
2021-01-05Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2021-01-05Houseintroduced in House
2020-11-19HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback