KY HB93 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-15 - WITHDRAWN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-15 - WITHDRAWN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 158.792 to include the employment of reading interventionists as a purpose of the reading diagnostic and intervention fund; prevent the state board of education from limiting grant recipients from expending grant funds for authorized purposes; direct that grant applications currently under consideration shall be subject to this Act; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to reading diagnostic and intervention grants and declaring and emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Derek Lewis [R] | Rep. Brandon Reed [R] | Rep. Adam Bowling [R] | Rep. Regina Huff [R] |
Rep. Ed Massey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2022-01-24 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | introduced in House |
2021-12-02 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Boards and Commissions
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Education, Finance
Effective Dates, Emergency
Fiscal Note
Teachers
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Education, Finance
Effective Dates, Emergency
Fiscal Note
Teachers