KY HB93 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - posted in committee
Pending: House Health and Family Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 311.844 to provide additional license renewal requirements for physician assistants with controlled substances prescriptive authority; amend KRS 311.854 to require the board to review and approve or deny physician assistant applications within 30 calendar days of receiving a completed application; amend KRS 311.856 to permit physician assistants to prescribe controlled substances; amend KRS 311.858 to permit physician assistants to prescribe controlled substances with specific restrictions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to physician assistants.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26Houseposted in committee
2019-01-10Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2019-01-08Houseintroduced in House
2018-12-12HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback