KY HB92 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 7)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 441.135 to allow jail canteen profits to be used for the enhancement of jail safety and security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to jail canteens.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 139 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1, SCTA 1 RSN# 435 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 29 (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-03Housebecame law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 7)
2018-03-02Housefiled without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State
2018-02-20Housedelivered to Governor
2018-02-20Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-02-15Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-02-15Housepassed 89-0
2018-02-15HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title)
2018-02-14Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title)
2018-02-13Houseto Rules (H)
2018-02-13Housereceived in House
2018-02-13Senate3rd reading, passed 34-2 with committee amendment (1-title) Committee Substitute (1)
2018-02-13Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 13, 2018
2018-02-08Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-07Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with committee amendments (1-title) Committee Substitute (1)
2018-01-22Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2018-01-19Senatereceived in Senate
2018-01-18House3rd reading, passed 88-0
2018-01-17Housetaken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
2018-01-16Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 17, 2018
2018-01-11House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-01-10Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2018-01-08Houseposted in committee
2018-01-04Houseto Local Government (H)
2018-01-02Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback