KY HB91 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 174)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Propose to create a new section of the Constitution of Kentucky to state that Kentucky's Constitution does not secure or protect a right to abortion or funding of abortion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT proposing an amendment to the Constitution of Kentucky relating to abortion.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1835 (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 127 (Y: 76 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30Housedelivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 174)
2021-03-30Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2021-03-30Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2021-03-30Housereceived in House
2021-03-30Senate3rd reading, passed 32-6
2021-03-29Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 30, 2021
2021-03-15Senatereported favorably, to Rules
2021-03-12Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2021-03-12Senate2nd reading
2021-03-12Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2021-03-11Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2021-03-11Senate1st reading
2021-03-11Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2021-03-11Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2021-02-26Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2021-02-26Senatereceived in Senate
2021-02-25House3rd reading, passed 76-20
2021-02-24Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 25, 2021
2021-02-22House2nd reading, to Rules
2021-02-11Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2021-02-09Houseposted in committee
2021-02-04Houseto Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
2021-01-05Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2021-01-05Houseintroduced in House
2020-11-18HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback