KY HB90 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-04 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 141 to establish a refundable income tax credit for the costs of mitigating noise from a commercial airport for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2018, but before January 1, 2022; amend KRS 131.190 to require certain information to be submitted to the Legislative Research Commission; amend various sections in the Kentucky Revised Statutes to make conforming changes; amend KRS 141.0205 to order the credit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to tax credits for airport noise mitigation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-04Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2018-01-02Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback