KY HB90 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 48)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 48)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 121.120 to require electronic filing of election finance reports for all candidates and slates of candidates running for statewide office, and for the campaign committees of those candidates and slates, beginning with the elections in 2015; allow electronic filing on the Internet or on optical or magnetic disk; amend KRS 121.180 to require the Kentucky Registry of Election Finance, if funds are available, to offer the option of electronic reporting to all candidates, committees, fundraisers, and persons making independent expenditures.
Title
AN ACT relating to election reports.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Cherry [D] | Rep. Tom Riner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 48) | |
2012-03-30 | delivered to Governor | |
2012-03-30 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | |
2012-03-28 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | |
2012-03-28 | received in House | |
2012-03-27 | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 | |
2012-03-27 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 27, 2012 | |
2012-03-22 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-03-21 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2012-02-16 | to State & Local Government (S) | |
2012-02-14 | received in Senate | |
2012-02-13 | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 | |
2012-02-08 | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day | |
2012-02-08 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 10, 2012 | |
2012-02-08 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-07 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2012-01-12 | posted in committee | |
2012-01-03 | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) | |
2012-01-03 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB90.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB90/bill.doc |