KY HB88 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - to Education (H)
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 to establish the goal of increasing time for physical activity to 20 minutes per day or 100 minutes per week in all schools with kindergarten through grade 5 by November 1, 2020; require the Kentucky Department of Education to identify model programs, provide resources and assessment tools, develop a checklist for collecting data for public reporting, encourage physical activity plans in schools containing grades 6 through 8, report to the Interim Joint Committee on Education and the Interim Joint Committee on Health and Welfare and Family Services by December 1, 2019, and annually thereafter on progress toward meeting the goal, and share aggregate school district and county data with the Cabinet for Health and Family Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to healthy goals for the school children of the Commonwealth.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-10Houseto Education (H)
2019-01-08Houseintroduced in House
2018-12-11HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback